+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 587.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 538.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 538.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 456.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 398.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 416.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 386.
- Substituted for HF 2179. H.J. 386.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 344.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 314.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 375.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 371.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 297.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 293.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor