+ − Transition
SF2213 is now HSB688
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 2408.
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 2320.
- Message from House.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays 2.
- Amendment H-8102 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment H-8120 to H-8102 filed, adopted.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8102 filed.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2320.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2408.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 12:30PM RM 304.1.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nordman, Deyoe and Meyer, B.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Koelker, Bisignano, and Johnson.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor