+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 674.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 587.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 647.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 645.
- Senate concurred with S-5082. S.J. 645.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5082. S.J. 611.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 549.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8109 adopted. H.J. 519.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 519.
- Immediate message. H.J. 532.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8109 filed. H.J. 490.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 489.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Maxwell, Gassman, and Lensing. H.J. 379.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Environmental Protection. H.J. 343.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 313.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 375.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 373.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 277.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 268.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor