+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 100, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8297.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8297 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-5083, as amended.
- Amendment S-5153 out of order.
- Amendment S-5159 adopted.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5159 to House amendment S-5083 filed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5153 to House amendment S-5083 filed.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5083.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 96 nays none.
- Amendment H-8150 adopted.
- Substituted for HF 2423.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8150 filed.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Chapman, and McCoy.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor