+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays 1.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Rizer, Hein and Meyer.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2018 1:30PM RM 315
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Garrett, and Bisignano.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor