+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2175.
- Message from House.
- Attached to companion HF 2552.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays none.
- Amendment H-8066 adopted.
- Withdrawn.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8066 filed.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 11:30AM House Lounge.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Sexton and Smith, R..
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 12:00PM RM G17.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Segebart, Boulton, and Kraayenbrink.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor