+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government.
- Referred to Local Government.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 18.
- Amendment S-5028 withdrawn.
- Amendment S-5045 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5044 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5030 lost.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-5028 and S-5030 filed.
- Deferred.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Amendments H-8002 and H-8003 filed.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2018 10:00AM RM 116
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Schultz, and Taylor.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/17/2018 3:15PM House Lounge
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Heartsill and Meyer.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor