+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5049 adopted.
- Senate concurred with S-5005, as amended.
- Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17.
- Immediate message.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-8072 filed.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken.
- House concurred H-8072.
- Passed House, yeas 51, nays 46.
- Immediate message.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5049 filed.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
- Message from House, with amendment S-5005.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8014, to amendment H-8011 lost.
- Substituted for HF 2243.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-8011 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 52, nays 48.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment S-5003 filed, lost.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, passed on file.
- Fiscal note.
- Amendment H-8011 filed.
- Amendment H-8014, to amendment H-8011 filed.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2142.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 2:00PM RM 315.
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Kraayenbrink, and Quirmbach.
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor