+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2132 substituted.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 2212.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of committee as SF 2132.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 1:30PM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 4:00PM RM 315.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Lohse and Judge.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Johnson, and Petersen.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor