+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2130.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2283 substituted.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2283.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 96 nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 2130.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2018 8:00AM House Lounge
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2018 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Moore, T., Gassman and Brown-Powers.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, C. Johnson, and Hart.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor