+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 9:30AM RM 315.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Chapman.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3086 filed.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 459.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Chapman.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor