+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-3155.
- Fiscal note, as amended by S-3155.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3155.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1102 adopted.
- Substituted for HF 534.
- Amendment H-1187 lost.
- Amendments H-1192 and H-1193 withdrawn.
- SF 346 substituted.
- Amendment H-1194 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 95 nays 4.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-1101 adopted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Amendments H-1187, H-1192, H-1193 and H-1194 filed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1101 filed.
- Amendment H-1102 filed.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3024 filed, ruled out of order.
- Amendment S-3022 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment S-3023 to S-3022 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-3022 filed.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 346.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Sweeney.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jones, Hinson and Bennett.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor