+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Cownie and Oldson.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0.
- Fiscal note.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Breitbach, C. Johnson, and McCoy.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor