+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Final
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- NOBA: Graybook
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Secretary's report on correction in enrollment.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5174 to S-5172 filed, lost.
- Message from House, with amendment S-5172.
- Amendment S-5177 to S-5172 filed, lost.
- Senate concurred with S-5172.
- Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21.
- Immediate message.
- NOBA: House Floor
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8293 to committee amendment H-8012 filed.
- Amendment H-8290, to committee amendment H-8012 filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-8292, to committee amendment H-8012 filed.
- Point of order raised on H-8292, to committee amendment H-8012, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8292, to committee amendment H-8012.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Amendment H-8294, to committee amendment H-8012 filed, lost.
- Point of order raised on H-8293, to committee amendment H-8012, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8293, to committee amendment H-8012.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken.
- Committee amendment H-8012 adopted, as amended.
- Passed House, ayes 59, nays 41.
- Immediate message.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- NOBA: House Full Approps
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8012 filed.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- NOBA: Senate Floor
- Subcommittee: Grassley, Hall and Hinson.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations.
- Message from Senate.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5008 to S-5005 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-5004 filed, withdrawn.
- Amendment S-5005 filed.
- Amendment S-5006 to S-5005 filed, lost.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment S-5007 to S-5005 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-5005 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment S-5001 out of order.
- Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 21.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5001 filed.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Senate Full Approps
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2018 3:00PM RM 22
- Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
Type:
Primary Sponsor