+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 674.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 610.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 519.
- Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 514.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 449.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Brandenburg, Dawson, and Gustafson. H.J. 379.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 318.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 309.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 322.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 321.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 171.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 167.
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor