+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2282.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 1:00PM RM G17.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Schultz.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sexton, Mitchell and Nielsen.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor