+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 99 nays none.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/20/2019 1:00PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Thorup, A. Meyer and Williams.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Johnson, and Wahls.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor