+ − Transition
SF2060 is now HF2168
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2060.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2168 substituted.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2060.
- Message from House.
- Attached to companion HF 2168.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2022 12:00PM Senate Lounge.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2168.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Celsi, and Cournoyer.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Andrews, Bergan and Ehlert.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor