+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8005 filed.
- Committee amendment H-8003 filed.
- Placed on calender.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on calendar.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.
- Subcommittee reassigned: Gassman, Hanusa and James.
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Education.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1084 filed.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Brink and Mascher.
- Read first time, referred to Education.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 316.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor