+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3226.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 54 nays 46.
- Amendment H-1137 out of order.
- Committee amendment H-1136 adopted.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1137 filed.
- Committee amendment H-1136 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Fisher, Hall and Thorup.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Natural Resources.
- Message from Senate.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 14.
- Amendment S-3008 filed, lost.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 203.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Boulton, and Segebart.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor