+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Koester, Lundgren and Wessel-Kroeschell.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 20.
- Amendment S-3010 filed, adopted.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor