+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans Affairs.
- Referred to Veterans Affairs.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 10:00AM House Lounge
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Gustafson, Zumbach and Staed.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Edler, Dawson, and Ragan.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans Affairs.
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Horn, and Smith.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor