+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1097 to H-1088 filed.
- Substituted for HF 513.
- Passed House, yeas 71, nays 28.
- Amendment H-1096 to H-1088 filed.
- Point of order raised on H-1096 to H-1088, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1096 to H-1088.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Immediate message.
- Point of order raised and withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1097 to H-1088 ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1097 to H-1088.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Amendment H-1088 adopted.
- SF 159 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- Point of order raised H-1097 to H-1088 .
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1088 filed.
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3078 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2019 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Moore, T., Kerr and R. Smith.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Johnson, Lofgren, and Quirmbach.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor