+ − Transition
SF151 is now HF312
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1156 filed.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 561.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 2:30PM RM 24A.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Johnson, and Kinney.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 3:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thorup, Breckenridge and Jeneary.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor