+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (52)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Graybook
- Signed by Governor.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
- Message from House.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Objection filed.
- Asked unanimous consent to suspend rules to consider H-1007.
- Point of order raised on H-1007, ruled not germane.
- Amendment H-1007 to H-1005 filed.
- Amendments H-1002 and H-1003 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1004 lost.
- Motion filed to reconsider withdrawal of H-1002.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Amendment H-1001 lost.
- Substituted for HF 118.
- Motion to suspend rules H-1007.
- Motion to reconsider failed
- Point of order raised on H-1005, ruled not germane.
- NOBA: House Floor
- Asked unanimous consent to suspend rules to consider H-1005.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 130 substituted.
- NOBA: Final
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 58, nays 38.
- Speaker ruled points not well taken.
- Points of order raised under Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Motion to suspend rules H-1005.
- Objection filed.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Amendments H-1004 and H-1005 filed.
- Amendments H-1001, H-1002 and H-1003 filed.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3003 lost.
- Amendment S-3006 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3002 lost.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3001 lost.
- Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 19.
- Immediate message.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- NOBA: Senate Floor
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Passed subcommittee.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Senate Full Approps
- Amendments S-3001, S-3002, and S-3003 filed.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Grassley, Hall and Landon.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2017 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2017 2:30PM RM 22
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
Type:
Primary Sponsor