+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 12:15PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Hite, Kurth and Wheeler.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 340.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Edler, Dawson, and R. Taylor.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor