+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture. S.J. 734.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 440.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 434.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Agriculture.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agriculture: Seng Chair, and Taylor,Beall,Black,Bowman,Brase,Hart,Sodders,Zumbach,Greiner,Guth,Houser, and Kapucian.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor