+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Danielson, Bertrand, and Horn. S.J. 117.
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Government. S.J. 734.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 449.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 438.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - State Government.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Government: Danielson Chair,Horn, and Sorenson.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor