+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Highfill, Deyoe, and Dunkel. H.J. 623.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 549.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Economic Growth.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Economic Growth: Sodders Chair,Danielson, and Chapman.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor