+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 505.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 440.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 439.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Agriculture.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agriculture: Seng Chair,Black, and Greiner.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor