+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 68, nays 29.
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2020 11:30AM House Lounge.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Wheeler, Carlson and Jacoby.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
- Message from Senate.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Feenstra, Quirmbach and Schultz.