+ − Transition
SSB1183 is now HF583
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 583 substituted.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 460.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 583.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 460.
- Message from House.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1114 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1114 filed.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 460.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 583..
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Johnson, Mathis, and Williams.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 12:00PM RM 19.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Cisneros and Judge.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.