+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 99 nays none.
- Substituted for HF 357.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 403 substituted.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bolkcom and Nunn.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Mitchell and Kressig.