+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Point of order raised on S-3156, ruled out of order.
- Substituted for SF 480.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3156 filed.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays 0.
- Withdrawn.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Immediate message.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 480.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Salmon, Forristall and Wessel-Kroeschell.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Greene.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor