+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 914.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 895.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 895.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 806.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 808.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 800.
- Amendment H-1258 withdrawn. H.J. 799.
- Withdrawn. H.J. 800.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Moore, Landon, and Riding. H.J. 656.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 551.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Transportation.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Danielson Chair,Taylor, and Behn.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor