+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 12:00PM Law Library (Cancelled)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Courtney, Bowman, and Whitver.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal note. House Clip Sheet.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- State Government: Bowman Chair, Johnson, Petersen
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recorded
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor