+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 4.
- Senate concurred with S-5017.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5017.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 92, nays 5.
- Committee amendment H-8010 adopted.
- Amendment H-8042 filed, withdrawn.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8010 filed.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Rogers, Dolecheck and Winckler.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Rogers, Gassman and Hanson.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3119 filed, lost.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-3085 adopted.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3085 filed.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 11:30AM RM 116
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Greene, and Quirmbach.