+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 420.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 544 substituted.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 544.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays 0.
- Explanation of vote.
- Immediate message.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 420.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2017 12:30PM House Lounge
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2017 1:30PM House Lounge (Cancelled)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bergan, Bacon and Mascher.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 1:30PM Rm 206
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, C. Johnson, and Jochum.