+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 87, nays 7.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Subcommittee: Hite, McConkey and Zumbach.
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Fiscal note.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2019 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Feenstra, Bolkcom and Smith, R..