+ − Transition
SSB1094 is now HF300
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (51)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted for SF 489.
- Amendment S-3154 adopted.
- Amendment S-3218 filed, adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1512.
- Senate amendment H-1512 filed.
- Passed House, yeas 90, nays 1.
- Immediate message.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Amendment S-3155 adopted.
- HF 708 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3155 filed.
- Amendment S-3154 filed.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 489.
- Message from House.
- Attached to similar HF 708.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 708.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 300.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 489.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2021 12:30PM RM 24A.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 1:00PM 217 Conference Room.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Worthan, Latham and Williams.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Johnson, and Taylor, T.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Worthan, Breckenridge and Thorup.
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.