+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 266 substituted.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 328.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 266.
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 328.
- Message from House.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays none.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Kinney and Shipley.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2019 11:00AM House Lounge.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Klein, Bergan and Konfrst.