+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted. S.J. 296.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 219.
- Resolution filed, placed on calendar. S.J. 215.
- Voted - Ethics.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ethics: Horn Chair,Dearden,Seng,Greiner,Whitver, and Behn.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded