+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 718.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 680.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 680.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 697.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 638.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 634.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8145. H.J. 634.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8145 filed. H.J. 568.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 563.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 629.
- Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays none. S.J. 629.
- Amendment S-5077 adopted. S.J. 628.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 619.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5077 filed. S.J. 608.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 556.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Taylor, Courtney, and Garrett. S.J. 83.
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Taylor, Courtney, and Zaun. S.J. 361.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 344.
- Message from House. S.J. 344.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 390.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 375.
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 370.
- Amendment H-1011 adopted. H.J. 370.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1011 filed. H.J. 268.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 241.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Quirmbach Chair,Hogg, and Schneider.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded