+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Sent to Governor.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 215 substituted.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none.
- Substituted for SF 400.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 215.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 400.
- Message from House.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1017 lost.
- Amendment H-1174 adopted.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0.
- Explanation of vote.
- Immediate message.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1174 filed.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 8:30AM RM 22
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1017 filed.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Anderson, Zaun, and Mathis.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Best, Hall and Holz.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2017 8:15AM House Lounge