+ − Transition
SF104 is now SF387
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 86, nays none.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 2.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Paustian, Kressig and Thorup.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Public Safety.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 387.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 10:00AM RM 111.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Reichman, Kinney, and Schultz.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor