+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- HF 596 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 596 substituted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 602.
- Withdrawn.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 97 nays none.
- Immediate message.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 602.
- Attached to companion HF 596.
- Attached to companion HF 596.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
- Fiscal note.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 602.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Johnson, Lofgren, and Ragan.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Mascher and Shipley.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Cournoyer, and Danielson.