+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 704.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 670.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 670.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 544.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 528.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 526.
- Substituted for Senate File 356. S.J. 526.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 356. S.J. 481.
- Message from House. S.J. 481.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 486.
- Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 476.
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Economic Growth.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 359.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Economic Growth: Sodders Chair,Hart, and Behn.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor