+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8155 filed.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8056 filed.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Fisher, Breckenridge and Kerr.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Shipley, and Kinney.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2017 9:00AM House Lounge
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Holt, Breckenridge and Kerr.