+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Windschitl, Oldson, and Sands. H.J. 749.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 550.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Government: Danielson Chair,Courtney, and Whitver.
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor