+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note, as amended by S-3186.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3186.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96 nays none.
- Committee amendment H-1135 adopted.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-1135 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2019 3:30PM House Lounge.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bergan and B. Meyer.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 2.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bergan and B. Meyer.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Chapman, Kinney and Shipley.